+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB40 is now Act 205
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- RULES SUSPENDED
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2016: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor