+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB392 is now Act 728
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 24
March 25, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor