+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Returned
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 10
March 16, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1