+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB383 is now Act 629
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Davis
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 10
March 12, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4