+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB382 is now Act 388
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
March 3, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor