+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB380 is now Act 477
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by G. Leding
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 13
February 27, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor