+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB374 is now Act 1018
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Rules suspended.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Re-referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Perry
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. English
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 1, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 23
March 13, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor