+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB368 is now Act 893
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 5 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 5
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 4
- Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 AND #3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Amendment #1 withdrawn
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of Amendment
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by C. Douglas
Amendment S5
Sponsored by J. English
Amendment S4
Sponsored by J. English
Amendment S3
Sponsored by J. English
Amendment S2
Sponsored by J. English
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. English
+ − Votes (3)
March 25, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
March 20, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 13
March 16, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor