+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB363 is now Act 339
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
February 28, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor