+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB362 is now Act 383
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4
February 27, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor