+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB359 is now Act 464
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
February 23, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor