+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB356 is now Act 504
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 12
March 6, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor