+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB352 is now Act 534
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 9
March 10, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor