+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB344 is now Act 386
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 15
February 20, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor