+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB344 is now Act 806
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
- Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Breaux
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 26, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 16
February 21, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor