+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB343 is now Act 398
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and failed.
- EXPUNGED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Rules suspended.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Hendren
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 15
March 4, 2015: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 15
March 4, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor