+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- The vote by which SB 343 FAILED of adoption was EXPUNGED.
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. King
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2017: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 1
March 20, 2017: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor