+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB341 is now Act 522
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 16
February 28, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor