+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB337 is now Act 248
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
February 23, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor