+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB320 is now Act 385
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 13
February 19, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor