+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB32 is now Act 970
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 4
- Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment S4
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
Amendment S3
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
March 30, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor