+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
- Sine Die adjournment
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
- Returned to the Senate.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S3
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
Amendment S2
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
+ − Vote
April 2, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1