+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment Chamber: Senate S2 Elliott 4/13/2021 4:00:25 PM PDF
Sponsored by Elliott
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Elliott
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor