+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB31 is now Act 7
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- Rules suspended.
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 2
January 27, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35