+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB305 is now Act 440
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
- Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Caldwell
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 13
March 15, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3