+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
- Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 4
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment S4
Sponsored by Rapert
Amendment S3
Sponsored by Rapert
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Rapert
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Rapert
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor