+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB300 is now Act 556
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 10
February 25, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor