+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB30 is now Act 19
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor