+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB3 is now Act 620
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On November 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by T. Garner
Amendment S1
Sponsored by T. Garner
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 12
March 7, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor