+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
- Received from the House.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate.
- Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by K. Hammer
+ − Vote
April 2, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor