+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB295 is now Act 780
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Flippo
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Flippo
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 7
March 18, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2