+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate.
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 and 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 and 2
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Key
Amendment S2
Sponsored by J. Key
+ − Vote
February 25, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor