+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB294 is now Act 198
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- RULES SUSPENDED
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor