+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB291 is now Act 171
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Bledsoe
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 2
February 24, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor