+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB289 is now Act 462
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- The vote by which SB289 passed and was ordered enrolled was expunged.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by B. Smith
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 18, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
March 15, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 8
February 10, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor