+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB289 is now Act 241
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
+ − Votes (2)
February 26, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4
February 18, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1