+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB284 is now Act 508
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Motion to Reconsider SB284 Passed.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Rep. Leding, G served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which SB284 Failed to Pass - 02/27/2017 03:32:04 PM
- Read the third time and failed.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- WITHDRAW Amendment #1.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Rules suspended.
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
March 1, 2017: Motion to Reconsider SB284 Passed.
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 19
March 1, 2017: Motion to Reconsider SB284 Passed.
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 19
March 1, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 13
February 27, 2017: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 18
February 8, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 5