+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB283 is now Act 575
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed as amended #1
- Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Rye
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 3, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
February 24, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor