+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB277 is now Act 342
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 and 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 and 3
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by J. Dismang
Amendment S3
Sponsored by J. Dismang
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Dismang
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 15
March 4, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor