+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB276 is now Act 755
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 2 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 2
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Rules suspended.
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 23, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 3
March 22, 2011: Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 2
February 22, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (113)
Type:
Primary Sponsor