+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB266 is now Act 366
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
February 13, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1