+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB265 is now Act 497
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Irvin
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
March 4, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor