+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB265 is now Act 857
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Salmon
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Shepherd
+ − Votes (3)
March 30, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 28, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 10
February 22, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor