+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB254 is now Act 401
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by K. Hammer
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 10
February 9, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor