+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB244 is now Act 281
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Held in the CHAMBER.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4
February 6, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
+ − Sponsors (86)
Type:
Primary Sponsor