+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB24 is now Act 250
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Suspend the Rules failed
- Motion passed and roll call requested
- Motion to Suspend the Rules
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
+ − Votes (3)
February 24, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 5
January 19, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
January 13, 2021: Motion to Suspend the Rules failed
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor