+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
- Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S3
Sponsored by M. Johnson
Amendment S2
Sponsored by M. Johnson
Amendment S1
Sponsored by M. Johnson
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor