+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB223 is now Act 695
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Rapert
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 20
March 13, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor