+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB222 is now Act 169
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 5
February 16, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35