+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB218 is now Act 630
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
March 18, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor